Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, West, Elfreth, Ferguson, Griffith, King, McCray, Peters, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for the construction, acquisition, renovation, and equipping of community mental health facilities, addiction facilities, and developmental disabilities facilities for which State grants can be provided under the Community Mental Health, Addiction, and Developmental Disabilities Capital Program; increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for certain projects that may be covered by State grants under the Federally Qualified Health Centers Grant Program; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0155
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {879632/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Appropriations 46
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1304, 24-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM