Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lam, McCray, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an employer, on request, to provide to an applicant for employment the wage range for the position for which the applicant applied; prohibiting an employer from taking negative actions against an applicant for employment because the applicant did not provide wage history or wage range; prohibiting an employer from relying on wage history, except when voluntarily provided, for the purpose of determining fair wage, and from seeking an applicant's wage history from former employers or their agents; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {263628/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 38
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Floor Amendment {263628/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-29) 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Wage History and Wage Range
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Economic Matters 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 3:04 PM