Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection Agreement
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person who is negotiating a specified solar installation and interconnection contract with specified customer-generator to submit to the customer-generator's electric company a specified application; allowing a specified person to accept a payment from the customer-generator in connection with the contract before receiving an approval from the customer-generator's electric company; prohibiting a specified person to begin a specified installation under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {597479/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM