Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Young, Astle, Currie, Feldman, Kagan, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing specified requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0370
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0418 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
(   27-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM