Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Residential Elevators - Inspections
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, beginning January 1, 2021, a certain elevator installed in a certain residential dwelling is subject to provisions of law requiring certain inspections; requiring certain inspections at certain times; exempting a certain elevator from a certain requirement; and requiring the installation of a life screen barrier by a certified elevator contractor.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Residential Elevators - Inspections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - Residential Elevators - Inspections
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Reassigned to Finance 18
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2020 10:30 AM