Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, under specified circumstances, the State Prosecutor to investigate a death of an individual that results directly from an action or an omission of a law enforcement officer of the State or of a political subdivision of the State while the officer is on duty or while the officer is off duty but performing activities that are within the scope of the officer's duties; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM