Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Carter, Hayes, Patterson, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to establish, by December 31, 2021, a training program and a skills review for nurses who care for medically fragile individuals in the individuals' homes; defining "medically fragile individual" as a person under 21 who has a complex medical condition requiring professional or parental supervision on a 24-hour basis; requiring, beginning January 1, 2022, a nurse who provides care to a medically fragile individual to complete a certain training program before beginning to provide care; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-301,   19-4A-01,   20-2001 through 20-2005 )
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 3:07 PM