Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Rates, Personal Exemptions, and Earned Income Tax Credit
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission)
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified State income tax rates for specified taxable years; altering the amount of specified exemptions allowed under the State income tax for specified taxable years; altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to increase the amount of credit that specified individuals with qualifying children may claim; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; providing the amount of the credit is adjusted for inflation each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1253
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {239538/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Raskin) Rejected (8-36)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195660/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {643427/1 Rejected (51-84)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (126-12)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Kasemeyer, Serafini, and DeGrange
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Delegates Walker, Kaiser, and D. Barnes
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {239538/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Raskin) Rejected (8-36) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {195660/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {643427/1 Rejected (51-84) 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (126-12) 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 66A
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Kasemeyer, Serafini, and DeGrange 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Refuses to Recede 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Delegates Walker, Kaiser, and D. Barnes 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-211, 10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM