Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Bates, Benson, Currie, Edwards, Ferguson, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Salling, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing a permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State until October 1, 2019, and only under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from engaging in hydraulic fracturing in a local jurisdiction unless the local jurisdiction has submitted to a referendum of the voters of the local jurisdiction a specified question and a majority of the voters have voted in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and Referenda
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:36 AM