Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a rebuttable presumption in child custody proceedings that joint custodial arrangements are in the best interests of a child; authorizing a court to consider specified factors when determining the best interests of the child; authorizing the court to award sole custody when a joint custodial arrangement is determined by a preponderance of evidence not to be in the best interests of the child; requiring the court to enter specified information on the record; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM