Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a solar farm from the requirement to submit a grading and sediment control plan in order to obtain a permit for grading or construction; exempting a solar farm from the requirement to submit a forest stand delineation and forest conservation plan in order to obtain a permit for grading or construction; and exempting a solar farm from the requirement to obtain a certificate of public convenience and necessity before constructing a generating station if the solar farm meets specified requirements.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1463
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM