Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Hershey, Hough, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program in the State Department of Education; providing that the purpose of the program is to establish intervention services for and to improve the education outcomes of young students with disabilities under specified circumstances; establishing eligibility requirements for students to participate in the Program; requiring the Department to verify the eligibility of specified students who apply for the Program within 10 days after receipt of a specified application; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 through 8-811 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM