Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0050
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0652
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0653
Title
Real Property Tax - Exemption Applications - Approval Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0655
Title
Property Tax - Public Utilities - Assessment Apportionment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 /CH0553
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0063 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
SB0081 /CH0050 Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0652 Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0653 Real Property Tax - Exemption Applications - Approval Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0655 Property Tax - Public Utilities - Assessment Apportionment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 /CH0553 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM