Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation


2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 401

File Code: Public Safety Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 535
Sponsored By:
Delegates Barnes, Malone, Ali, Conway, Costa, DeBoy, Frush, Glassman, Hubbard, Jennings, Kipke, Levi, Mathias, Morhaim, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Ross, Stein, Stull, Weir, and Weldon
Entitled:
Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Alarms

Synopsis:

Requiring the installation of a carbon monoxide alarm in a central location outside of each sleeping area or, under specified circumstances, within 25 feet of any carbon monoxide-producing fixture and equipment within a dwelling; prohibiting a person from rendering a carbon monoxide alarm inoperable with a specified exception; requiring that a specified disclosure form include specified information about a carbon monoxide alarm under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
2/2
First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/17
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/21
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Special Order later today (Senator Jacobs) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 401

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Norman H. Conway, District 38B
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Steven J. DeBoy, Sr., District 12A
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Barry Glassman, District 35A
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate J. B. Jennings, District 7
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Gerron Levi, District 23A
Delegate James E. Malone, Jr., District 12A
Delegate James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38B
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Joseline Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11
Delegate Paul S. Stull, District 4A
Delegate Michael H. Weir, Jr., District 6
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Disclosure
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Hotels and Motels
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condominiums; Mobile Homes
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Notices
Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Public Safety
( 12-1101 , 12-1102 , 12-1103 , 12-1104 , 12-1105 , 12-1106 )
Real Property
( 10-702 , 10-702 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 590919/01     Offered on: March 19, 2007   at: 8:16 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 534637/01     Offered on: April 5, 2007   at: 10:52 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 17, 2007: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
April 4, 2007: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Senate
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (44-3)