Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation


2008 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 712

File Code: Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 1231
Sponsored By:
Senators Haines, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, DeGrange, Della, Exum, Garagiola, Glassman, Kramer, Munson, Stoltzfus, Stone, Jacobs, Mooney, and Simonaire
Entitled:
Vehicle Laws - Failure to Yield Right-of-Way - Penalties for Death or Serious Bodily Injury

Synopsis:

Establishing that if a person fails to yield the right-of-way in violation of specified provisions of law and the violation contributes to an accident that results in the death or serious bodily injury of another, the person is subject to a specified fine and the Motor Vehicle Administration is authorized to suspend the person's license for a specified period of time; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/1
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/2
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/18
First Reading Environmental Matters
3/21
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/29
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/30
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/13
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 443

Sponsored by:

Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator David R. Brinkley, District 4
Senator Richard F. Colburn, District 37
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr., District 32
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator Donald F. Munson, District 2
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator J. Lowell Stoltzfus, District 38
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Accidents
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death.
Drivers` Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Penalties
Traffic Regulations

Bill affects the following Statute:

Transportation
( 27-114 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 368572/01     Offered on: March 19, 2008   at: 10:33 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 420016/01     Offered on: April 4, 2008   at: 11:08 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 21, 2008: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 2, 2008: Third Reading Passed (43-0)
House
March 30, 2008: Third Reading Passed (139-0)