Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 447

File Code: Public Safety Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 1267
Sponsored By:
Senators Muse, Frosh, Haines, Mooney, Peters, Raskin, Stone, Brochin, Forehand, Gladden, Jacobs, and Simonaire
Entitled:
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports

Synopsis:

Requiring the Police Training Commission, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, to develop a standardized format that specified law enforcement agencies shall use in reporting specified data relating to the activation and deployment of specified SWAT teams to the Office and specified local officials; requiring, every 6 months beginning January 1, 2010, a law enforcement agency that maintains a SWAT team to make specified reports to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/4
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/19
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
4/10
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/20
First Reading Judiciary
3/23
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/8
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-13)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 542

Sponsored by:

Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator James Brochin, District 42
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Police Training Commission
Reports
Sunset

Bill affects the following Statute:

Public Safety
( 3-507 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 948577/01     Offered on: March 17, 2009   at: 11:17 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 172614/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 12:35 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 19, 2009: Third Reading Passed (43-0)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
House
April 8, 2009: Third Reading Passed (123-13)