Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 14

File Code: Public Safety
Sponsored By:
Senator Gladden
Entitled:
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops

Synopsis:

Requiring law enforcement officers to record data pertaining to traffic stops; requiring law enforcement agencies to report the information to the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center (MSAC); requiring the Police Training Commission to develop guidelines and a model format to record data; requiring the MSAC to report to the Police Training Commission those law enforcement agencies that fail to comply with the reporting requirements; providing exceptions for law enforcement agencies subject to specified agreements; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/14
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21

Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/22
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Robey) Adopted
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/26
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
4/5
Senate Concur - House Amendments (35-12)
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/27
First Reading Environmental Matters
3/30
Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (48-86)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 172

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Discrimination
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Minorities -see also- Women
Police Training Commission
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Traffic Regulation

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Transportation
( 25-113 , 25-113 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 468177/02     Offered on: March 24, 2011   at: 11:42 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 510813/01     Offered on: April 7, 2011   at: 12:03 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 623429/01     Offered on: April 8, 2011   at: 1:03 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
House
Environmental Matters
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 26, 2011: Third Reading Passed (31-15)
April 5, 2011: Senate Concur - House Amendments (35-12)
April 5, 2011: Third Reading Passed (36-11)
House
April 4, 2011: Floor Amendment (Cluster) {623429/1 Rejected (48-86)
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (94-42)