About Legislation

Legislation Introduced during the
2015 Regular Session

Senate
BillsSB0001 - SB0942
Joint ResolutionsSJ0001 - SJ0006

House
BillsHB0001 - HB1292
Joint ResolutionsHJ0001 - HJ0008

Enacted Legislation
ChaptersCH0001 - CH0494

Status of All Legislation

Note:
Information may not be available for all numbers in each range.

Sponsorship for bills proposed by the Governor and state agencies is listed with the official title of a legislator rather than the Governor due to requirements in the Maryland Constitution. For these bills sponsorship is shown as:

  • The Speaker (By Request of Administration)
  • The President (By Request of Administration)
  • Committee Chair (By Request of Department)

The Legislative Process


Look Up - 2015 Regular Session


Proceedings - House Audio

You must have a media player installed that will play MP4 files. If you do not already have a media player installed, a free version of Real Player is available.


Date and Session Number
Monday, April 13, 2015 Session # 5
Monday, April 13, 2015 Session # 4
Monday, April 13, 2015 Session # 3
Monday, April 13, 2015 Session # 2
Monday, April 13, 2015 Session # 1
Saturday, April 11, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, April 10, 2015 Session # 2
Friday, April 10, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, April 09, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, April 06, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, April 03, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, April 02, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, March 30, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, March 27, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, March 26, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, March 25, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, March 23, 2015 Session # 2
Monday, March 23, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, March 20, 2015 Session # 2
Friday, March 20, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, March 19, 2015 Session # 2
Thursday, March 19, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 Session # 2
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, March 16, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, March 13, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, March 12, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, March 09, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, March 06, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, March 05, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, March 02, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, February 27, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, February 26, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, February 24, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, February 23, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, February 20, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, February 19, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, February 16, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, February 13, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, February 12, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, February 09, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, February 06, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, February 05, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, February 02, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, January 30, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, January 29, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, January 27, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, January 26, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, January 23, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, January 22, 2015 Session # 2
Thursday, January 22, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, January 21, 2015 Session # 1
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 Session # 1
Monday, January 19, 2015 Session # 1
Friday, January 16, 2015 Session # 1
Thursday, January 15, 2015 Session # 1
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 Session # 1

November 20, 2015 7:33 P.M.