About Legislation

Legislation Introduced during the
2017 Regular Session

Senate
BillsSB0001 - SB1198
Joint ResolutionsSJ0001 - SJ0008

House
BillsHB0001 - HB1661
Joint ResolutionsHJ0001 - HJ0009
Simple ResolutionsHS0001

Enacted Legislation
ChaptersCH0001 - CH0002
Joint ResolutionsJR0001

Status of All Legislation

Note:
Information may not be available for all numbers in each range.

Sponsorship for bills proposed by the Governor and state agencies is listed with the official title of a legislator rather than the Governor due to requirements in the Maryland Constitution. For these bills sponsorship is shown as:

  • The Speaker (By Request of Administration)
  • The President (By Request of Administration)
  • Committee Chair (By Request of Department)

The Legislative Process


Look Up - 2017 Regular Session

Synopsis - House Legislation

DateNumberPDFHtml
March 14, 201737PDF PageHTML Page
March 13, 201736PDF PageHTML Page
March 9, 201735PDF PageHTML Page
March 7, 201734PDF PageHTML Page
March 6, 201733PDF PageHTML Page
March 3, 201732PDF PageHTML Page
March 2, 201731PDF PageHTML Page
March 1, 201730PDF PageHTML Page
February 27, 201729PDF PageHTML Page
February 24, 201728PDF PageHTML Page
February 23, 201727PDF PageHTML Page
February 22, 201726PDF PageHTML Page
February 20, 201725PDF PageHTML Page
February 17, 201724PDF PageHTML Page
February 16, 201723PDF PageHTML Page
February 15, 201722PDF PageHTML Page
February 13, 201721PDF PageHTML Page
February 10, 201720BPDF PageHTML Page
February 10, 201720APDF PageHTML Page
February 9, 201719PDF PageHTML Page
February 8, 201718PDF PageHTML Page
February 7, 201717PDF PageHTML Page
February 6, 201716PDF PageHTML Page
February 3, 201715PDF PageHTML Page
February 2, 201714PDF PageHTML Page
February 1, 201713PDF PageHTML Page
January 30, 201712PDF PageHTML Page
January 27, 201711PDF PageHTML Page
January 26, 201710PDF PageHTML Page
January 25, 20179PDF PageHTML Page
January 23, 20178PDF PageHTML Page
January 20, 20177PDF PageHTML Page
January 19, 20176PDF PageHTML Page
January 18, 20175PDF PageHTML Page
January 16, 20174PDF PageHTML Page
January 13, 20173PDF PageHTML Page
January 12, 20172PDF PageHTML Page
January 11, 20171PDF PageHTML Page

March 13, 2017 9:52 P.M.