About Legislation

Legislation Introduced during the
2017 Regular Session

Senate
BillsSB0001 - SB1200
Joint ResolutionsSJ0001 - SJ0008

House
BillsHB0001 - HB1661
Joint ResolutionsHJ0001 - HJ0010
Simple ResolutionsHS0001

Enacted Legislation
ChaptersCH0001 - CH0568
Joint ResolutionsJR0001

Status of All Legislation

Note:
Information may not be available for all numbers in each range.

Sponsorship for bills proposed by the Governor and state agencies is listed with the official title of a legislator rather than the Governor due to requirements in the Maryland Constitution. For these bills sponsorship is shown as:

  • The Speaker (By Request of Administration)
  • The President (By Request of Administration)
  • Committee Chair (By Request of Department)

The Legislative Process


Look Up - 2017 Regular Session

Synopsis - Senate Legislation

DateNumberPDFHtml
April 5, 201751PDF PageHTML Page
March 30, 201750PDF PageHTML Page
March 24, 201749PDF PageHTML Page
March 23, 201748PDF PageHTML Page
March 20, 201747PDF PageHTML Page
March 17, 201746PDF PageHTML Page
March 16, 201745PDF PageHTML Page
March 15, 201744PDF PageHTML Page
March 13, 201743PDF PageHTML Page
March 10, 201742PDF PageHTML Page
March 7, 201741PDF PageHTML Page
March 7, 201740PDF PageHTML Page
March 6, 201739PDF PageHTML Page
March 3, 201738PDF PageHTML Page
March 2, 201737PDF PageHTML Page
March 1, 201736PDF PageHTML Page
February 28, 201735PDF PageHTML Page
February 27, 201734PDF PageHTML Page
February 24, 201733PDF PageHTML Page
February 23, 201732PDF PageHTML Page
February 22, 201731PDF PageHTML Page
February 21, 201730PDF PageHTML Page
February 20, 201729PDF PageHTML Page
February 17, 201728PDF PageHTML Page
February 16, 201727PDF PageHTML Page
February 15, 201726PDF PageHTML Page
February 14, 201725PDF PageHTML Page
February 13, 201724PDF PageHTML Page
February 10, 201723PDF PageHTML Page
February 9, 201722PDF PageHTML Page
February 8, 201721PDF PageHTML Page
February 7, 201720PDF PageHTML Page
February 6, 201719PDF PageHTML Page
February 3, 201718PDF PageHTML Page
February 2, 201717PDF PageHTML Page
February 1, 201716PDF PageHTML Page
January 31, 201715PDF PageHTML Page
January 30, 201714PDF PageHTML Page
January 27, 201713PDF PageHTML Page
January 26, 201712PDF PageHTML Page
January 25, 201711PDF PageHTML Page
January 24, 201710PDF PageHTML Page
January 23, 20179PDF PageHTML Page
January 20, 20178PDF PageHTML Page
January 19, 20177PDF PageHTML Page
January 18, 20176PDF PageHTML Page
January 17, 20175PDF PageHTML Page
January 16, 20174PDF PageHTML Page
January 13, 20173PDF PageHTML Page
January 12, 20172PDF PageHTML Page
January 11, 20171PDF PageHTML Page

May 4, 2017 4:51 P.M.