About Legislation

Legislation Introduced during the
2018 Regular Session

Senate
BillsSB0001 - SB0258
Joint ResolutionsSJ0001 - SJ0002

House
BillsHB0001 - HB0284
Joint ResolutionsHJ0001

Enacted Legislation
ChaptersCH0001 - CH0002

Status of All Legislation

Note:
Information may not be available for all numbers in each range.

Sponsorship for bills proposed by the Governor and state agencies is listed with the official title of a legislator rather than the Governor due to requirements in the Maryland Constitution. For these bills sponsorship is shown as:

  • The Speaker (By Request of Administration)
  • The President (By Request of Administration)
  • Committee Chair (By Request of Department)

The Legislative Process


Look Up - 2018 Regular Session

Synopsis - House Legislation

DateNumberPDFHtml
January 19, 20187PDF PageHTML Page
January 18, 20186PDF PageHTML Page
January 17, 20185PDF PageHTML Page
January 15, 20184PDF PageHTML Page
January 12, 20183PDF PageHTML Page
January 11, 20182PDF PageHTML Page
January 10, 20181PDF PageHTML Page

January 18, 2018 6:21 P.M.