Horse Racing (C6)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0988 / CH0434
    (SB0527)
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1426
    (SB1080)
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an OrganizationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0527
    (HB0988 / CH0434)
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1026Maryland State Fair - Funding ExtensionSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB1080
    (HB1426)
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an OrganizationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2014 11:39 A.M.