Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0989Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug TestingSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0809 / CH0552
    (HB1303 / CH0553)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0640 / CH0071
    (HB0838 / CH0072)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination DateSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 71Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0421 / CH0053
    (HB0950 / CH0054)
Circuit Court Clerks - SalarySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0409
    (HB0697 / CH0634)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - ApplicabilitySenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0382Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of FirearmsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0295Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0294Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0268Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public InformationSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0267 / CH0038
    (HB0116 / CH0039)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0262 / CH0035
    (HB0129)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0196 / CH0029
    (HB0626)
Register of Wills - SalarySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0172
    (HB0163)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0168 / CH0196
    (HB0008)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0156
    (HB0192)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1303 / CH0553
    (SB0809 / CH0552)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0950 / CH0054
    (SB0421 / CH0053)
Circuit Court Clerks - SalaryDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0838 / CH0072
    (SB0640 / CH0071)
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Extension of Termination DateDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0697 / CH0634
    (SB0409)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - ApplicabilityDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0626
    (SB0196 / CH0029)
Register of Wills - SalaryDelegate MitchellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0599Courts - Jury Service - Employer CompensationDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0192
    (SB0156)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0163
    (SB0172)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
HB0129
    (SB0262 / CH0035)
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in MarylandChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0116 / CH0039
    (SB0267 / CH0038)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBudget and Taxation
HB0008
    (SB0168 / CH0196)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsDelegate VitaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.