HB0047 (CH0199)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jameson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199


Synopsis:Authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems retailer license to make sales to consumers through the mail, a computer network, a telephonic network, or another electronic network; authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler distributor license or an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler importer license to sell electronic nicotine delivery systems to vape shop vendors; authorizing licensed vape shop vendors to make certain purchases from certain distributors; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Jameson
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Electronic Commerce -see also- Electronic Funds Transfer
Emergency Bills
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Postal Service
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Tobacco
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(16.7-204)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/6/201711/6/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20182/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2/8/20182/8/2018Favorable with Amendments {493998/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/13/20182/13/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)25
Senate2/14/20182/14/2018First Reading Finance26
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.