HB0066 (CH0385)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - Prohibited

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lam

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385


Synopsis:Prohibiting specified persons from using, allowing to be used, or selling specified lead wheel weights after January 1, 2020; requiring the State to ensure that no vehicle purchased for the State fleet after January 1, 2019, is equipped with an externally attached lead wheel weight that is composed of greater than 0.1% lead or 0.1% mercury by weight; prohibiting a tire on a vehicle in the State fleet that is balanced or replaced after January 1, 2018, from being equipped with specified lead wheel weights; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Lam
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1328 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Environment, Department of
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Recycling
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Environment
(6-501)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:05 A.M.