HB0100 (CH0154)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; defining "emergency services personnel" as emergency medical technicians or paramedics; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Beidle, Bromwell, Carey, Chang, Lisanti, Luedtke, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Krimm, Long, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0597
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0227 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-209)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
2/16/20172/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/17/20172/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {295569/1 Report Adopted28
Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Clark) Adopted 28
2/21/20172/21/2017Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)32
Senate2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation31
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.