HB0174

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Veto sustained (0-140)


Synopsis:Requiring an individualized education program team to obtain written consent from a parent of a child with a disability if the team proposes specified actions; requiring an individualized education program team, in specified circumstances, to send a parent written notice no later than 5 business days after the individualized education program team meeting that informs the parents of specified rights to consent or refuse to consent; authorizing the use of specified dispute resolution options; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, Kelly, Vogt, Walker, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Curriculum
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(8-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/23/20171/23/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {395765/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {214236/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/10/20181/10/2018Veto sustained (0-140)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 11, 2018 7:30 A.M.