HB0188 (CH0045)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45


Synopsis:Altering the eligibility criteria for membership on the State Board of Architects and the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors; requiring at least three members of the State Board of Architects to hold a professional degree from an architecture program accredited by the National Architectural Accrediting Board; requiring one member of the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors to be either a licensed property line surveyor or a professional land surveyor; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0077
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Business Regulation and Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Architects
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Surveyors
Statutes:Article - Business Occupations and Professions
(15-202, 3-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:35 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Economic Matters
1/19/20181/19/2018Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2/7/20182/7/2018Favorable Report Adopted21
Second Reading Passed21
2/9/20182/9/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)23
Senate2/12/20182/12/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs24
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.