HB0263

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is deemed to be a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for specified communications; providing for the prospective application of the Act to causes of action arising on or after October 1, 2016; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Rosenberg
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Court Costs
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Evidence
Hearings
Human Rights
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Petitions
Witnesses
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(12-303, 5-807)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20161/25/2016First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {562913/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/11/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/14/20163/14/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings43
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.