HB0365 (CH0262)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jackson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "electronic communication" to include social media communications; requiring the State Board of Education by September 1, 2016, and every 5 years thereafter, to update its model policy prohibiting bullying, harassment, or intimidation; requiring specified county boards of education to update specified policies based on the State Board's update of the model policy and to submit the updated policies to the State Superintendent of Schools by January 1, 2017, and every 5 years thereafter; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jackson, Angel, Chang, Hettleman, C. Howard, Knotts, Korman, Lierman, McConkey, McKay, Morales, Patterson, Sanchez, Smith, Tarlau, Zucker, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, Hornberger, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Platt, Shoemaker, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Electronic Government
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Information
Public Schools
Recordings -see also- Video
Reports
School Buses
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-424.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {585066/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.