HB0528 (CH0190)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Utilities – Water or Sewage Disposal Systems – Rates

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jameson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190


Synopsis:Allowing the Public Service Commission, after notice to customers and holding a public hearing and an evidentiary hearing, to authorize a certain rate consolidation of two or more water or sewage disposal systems if the systems have common ownership and the rate consolidation is in the public interest.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jameson and Mautz
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0337
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Service Commission
Sewage
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(4-307)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:51 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20182/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2/8/20182/8/2018Favorable with Amendments {363494/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/13/20182/13/2018Third Reading Passed (139-0)25
Senate2/14/20182/14/2018First Reading Finance26
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)55
House3/29/20183/22/2018Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.