HB0616

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing a Maryland small or independent film entity to qualify as a film production entity under certain circumstances; altering a certain audit requirement to apply only to an entity with total direct costs that exceed $500,000; altering the amount of certain tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Commerce may issue under certain circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates M. Washington, Ali, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, and Afzali
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce, Department of
Income Tax
Motion Pictures
Small Business
Tax Credits
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-730)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 28, 2018 9:11 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {905566/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (133-3)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 12:41 P.M.