HB0653 (CH0215)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks

Sponsored by:

Delegate Young, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215


Synopsis:Requiring that certain patients be advised of the benefits and risks associated with the prescription of certain opioids and benzodiazepines under certain circumstances; and providing that a violation of the Act is grounds for disciplinary action by the health occupations board that regulates the health care provider who commits the violation.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Young, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, Kelly, Lafferty, Mautz, McMillan, Metzgar, Morales, Platt, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Turner, Vogt, Pena-Melnyk, West, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, and Morgan
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Discipline
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Patients
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Review Boards
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(1-223, 14-404, 16-311, 4-315, 8-316)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 9, 2018 1:24 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable with Amendments {516289/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (131-6)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018First Reading Senate Rules62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.