HB0714 (CH0679)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Delegate McMillan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679


Synopsis:Extending the termination date to September 30, 2022, for certain provisions of law authorizing certain hybrid vehicles to use a certain high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under certain circumstances; extending the termination date to September 30, 2022 for certain provisions of law making certain requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates McMillan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ciliberti, Anderton, Beidle, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lafferty, McCray, Otto, Robinson, and Stein
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0751
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Alternative Energy Sources
Highways
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Sunset
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2010, 2013, 2016)
Article - Transportation
(25-108)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (38-8)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.