HB0968 (CH0397)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barnes, B.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397


Synopsis:Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Program; requiring the Committee to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Program; providing that a public school participant may use other types of financing or bidding; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates B. Barnes, Frush, and Pena-Melnyk
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Harford County
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-314)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/4/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {654462/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)61
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (42-2)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.