HB1003 (CH0557)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valderrama

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557


Synopsis:Altering a specified provision of law concerning equal pay for equal work to prohibit discrimination on the basis of gender identity; prohibiting an employer from discriminating between employees in any occupation by providing less favorable employment opportunities based on sex or gender identity; prohibiting an employer from forbidding an employee from inquiring about, discussing, or disclosing the wages of specified employees or requesting that the employer provide a reason why the employee's wages are a condition of employment; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Valderrama, Davis, K. Young, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Carey, Carr, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Simonaire, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0481
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1051 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Damages
Discipline
Discrimination
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Industry and Technology
Interest
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Sexual Orientation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-301, 3-304, 3-306, 3-307, 3-308, 3-304.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {453897/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 46
3/17/20163/15/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate Grammer) {583528/1 Rejected (49-87)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {303528/1 Rejected (50-87)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {373324/1 Rejected (47-90)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {833628/1 Rejected (53-86)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {313024/1 Rejected (47-89)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {873621/1 Rejected (45-89)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {973922/1 Rejected (48-87)47
Floor Amendment (Delegate Malone) {203322/1 Rejected (48-88)47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (93-47)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Finance47A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {407776/159
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments {407776/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)61A
House4/9/20164/3/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments66A
Third Reading Passed (103-33)66A
Passed Enrolled66A
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.