HB1174

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood Dealers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jacobs

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Authorizing a seafood dealer that uses a conveyor to load oysters from a boat into a truck to possess up to a 10% tolerance for undersized oysters and shells.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, Ghrist, Long, and Otto
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Hunting and Fishing
Narrow Subject(s):Boats and Ships
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Industry and Technology
Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Trucks
Weights and Measures
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(4-1017)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 28, 2018 8:49 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 3, 2018 7:53 P.M.