HB1275

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community Center

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sample-Hughes

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Good Shepherd Association for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Maces Lane Community Center, located in Dorchester County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Sample-Hughes and Mautz
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0710
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2019 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 186). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 186 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):Community Facilities and Services
Dorchester County
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2018 1:31 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/28/20182/28/2018Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Unfavorable Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 2:51 P.M.