HB1335

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Parrott

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting a physician, except under certain circumstances, from performing an abortion on an unmarried minor unless the physician obtains certain consent from the parent or guardian of the minor; authorizing a physician to perform an abortion on a minor without the consent of the minor's parent or guardian under certain circumstances; authorizing a minor to file a certain petition with a certain court for a certain waiver; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Parrott, Glass, Malone, McComas, McConkey, Otto, Rey, and Wivell
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Abortion -see also- Reproductive Matters
Child Abuse and Neglect
Circuit Courts
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Court Costs
Emergencies
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Legal Aid
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notaries Public
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Petitions
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control
Sexual Offenses
Time
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(20-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 10, 2018 12:20 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 4:01 P.M.