HB1341

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

College Affordability – Maryland 529 Plans and Student Loan Debt Relief Tax Credit – Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments


Synopsis:Requiring the Maryland 529 Board to develop an application form for a certain State contribution program that includes certain information; requiring the Governor to provide appropriations of $5,000,000 in fiscal year 2018 and $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2019 and each fiscal year thereafter; altering the name of the Maryland College Investment Plan and Prepaid College Trust to refer to Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer; altering the date by which the Board is required to develop and implement an outreach and marketing plan; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Jones, B. Barnes, Haynes, Hettleman, Korman, and Stein
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Appropriations
Comptroller
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Income Tax
Investments -see also- Securities
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
State Aid
Tax Credits
Time
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-1901, 18-1902.1, 18-1903, 18-1904, 18-1909, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04.1, 18-19A-05, 18-19A-06, 18-19B-05, 18-19C-05)
Article - Tax - General
(10-740)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 9:21 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {194863/1 Report Adopted69
Second Reading Passed with Amendments69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 10:42 P.M.