HB1454 (CH0842)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit – Commercial Rehabilitations – Affordable Housing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842


Synopsis:Authorizing an additional 5% tax credit for certain expenditures under the Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as affordable housing; requiring that the amount of an expired or unclaimed initial credit certificate remain in a certain Reserve Fund and increase the amount of initial credit certificates that the Maryland Historical Trust may issue for the following fiscal year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Washington, Barron, C. Howard, Jackson, and Lierman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0967
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Income Tax
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Tax Credits
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(5A-303)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {395862/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (109-29)55
Senate3/29/20183/26/2018First Reading Senate Rules57
4/4/20184/5/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/2/2018Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/9/20184/3/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
House4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/26/20185/26/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.