HB1470

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation


Synopsis:Prohibiting a public service company from terminating water or sewer service to a multifamily dwelling unit in Baltimore City based on the nonpayment of charges; requiring a landlord who collects certain fees or charges in Baltimore City to provide certain billing data to the tenant or provide certain authorization that allows the tenant to directly access certain billing data; authorizing a landlord in Baltimore City to collect certain fees and charges under certain circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Leases and Rent
Notices
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers
Sewage
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(7-307.3)
Article - Real Property
(8-208, 8-401, 8-402.1, 8-119)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 14, 2018 4:17 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 23, 2018 12:58 P.M.