HB1503

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lisanti

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations


Synopsis:Designating the canvasback duck as the State waterfowl.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Lisanti
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0061 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Birds
Chesapeake Bay
State Symbols
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(7-311)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 5:15 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 4:03 P.M.