HB1574

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Health Record and Payment Clearinghouse Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hill

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing a Maryland Health Record and Payment Clearing House Pilot Program; requiring the Maryland Department of Health on or before December 31, 2018, to identify a certain group to which the Program shall apply; requiring the Department on or before July 1, 2020, to collaborate with the Health Care Commission to implement the Pilot Program; requiring the Commission to develop the Program within the Department by July 1, 2019; requiring the Commission to submit an annual report on the status of the implementation of the Program; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Delegates Hill, Flanagan, and Lam
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Cybersecurity -see also- Safety
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Care Commission
Health, Department of
Identification
Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs
Medical Assistance
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(19-150, 19-151)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 15, 2018 12:31 P.M.