HB1592 (CH0221)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and Membership

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valderrama

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221


Synopsis:Requiring that the membership of the Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. consist of each licensed owner and trainer who is subject to a certain assessment; altering the circumstances under which a jockey is a covered employee under workers' compensation law; altering a certain provision of law to provide that the employer of a jockey who is a covered employee under workers' compensation law is the Fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Valderrama, Arentz, Barkley, Clippinger, Fennell, Glenn, Impallaria, Jameson, and Mautz
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0851
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Horse Racing
Workers' Compensation
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Racing
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Workers' Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(11-902)
Article - Labor and Employment
(9-1015, 9-212)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 9, 2018 1:34 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {943299/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/26/20183/26/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/4/20183/26/2018Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.