HB1613

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sanchez

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Making certain provisions relating to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in cases of incapacity, debilitation, or death of a parent applicable to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in the event of an adverse immigration action being initiated against a parent; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Sanchez
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Estates and Trusts
Narrow Subject(s):Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Emergency Bills
Estates and Trusts -see also- Beneficiaries
Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
State Documents -see also- Maryland Register
Statutes:Article - Estates and Trusts
(13-901, 13-902, 13-903, 13-904, 13-907)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 30, 2018 2:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/15/20182/15/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {312316/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (130-6)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 11:30 A.M.