HB1634 (CH0731)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frick

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving certain services; requiring the Commissioner to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Frick, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Gaines, Healey, Hettleman, Jones, Lierman, Pendergrass, Reznik, Stein, Turner, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Accountants
Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fingerprinting
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Governor
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Postal Service
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Reports
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Students
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Business Regulation
(7-101, 7-205)
Article - Commercial Law
(13-101, 13-301, 13-303, 13-410, 14-202, 14-4101 through 14-4104)
Article - Financial Institutions
(11-201, 11-504, 11-517, 11-602, 11-615, 12-105, 12-126, 12-405, 12-426, 12-906, 12-928, 2-115, 2-116, 2-104.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/17/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (87-46)47A
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance63
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29)63
Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance Adopted63
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (93-42)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.