State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB1051Maryland Private Sector Employees Pension Plan Task ForceSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0908
    (HB1426)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of RetireesSenator RobeyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885
    (HB1384)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - County RepresentationSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0813 / CH0556
    (HB0718)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0801 / CH0550
    (HB0852 / CH0551)
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0800
    (HB0258)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0751
    (HB0902 / CH0649)
State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of RetireesSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0741 / CH0534
    (HB0390 / CH0535)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of TrusteesSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0674 / CH0522Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0477 / CH0479
    (HB0494 / CH0480)
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in ServiceSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0476 / CH0477
    (HB0495 / CH0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0475
    (HB0379)
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and DeductionsSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0474 / CH0475
    (HB0496 / CH0476)
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or SurplusesSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0470 / CH0472Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0269 / CH0220
    (HB0376 / CH0221)
State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in BenefitsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1518Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's OfficeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1426
    (SB0908)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of RetireesDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1414State Retirement and Pension System - Report on Proposal to Authorize Counties to Elect Alternate Pension Options for TeachersDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1384
    (SB0885)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - County RepresentationDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1383Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Expanded EligibilityDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1318Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1264Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a CrimeDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1024Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - MembershipDelegate McDermottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0902 / CH0649
    (SB0751)
State Police Retirement System - Reemployment of RetireesDelegate GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 649Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0852 / CH0551
    (SB0801 / CH0550)
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and ClarificationDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0819Prudent Pension Management ActDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0780State Employees Pension Choice ActDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0718
    (SB0813 / CH0556)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveDelegate SerafiniVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0496 / CH0476
    (SB0474 / CH0475)
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or SurplusesDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 476Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0495 / CH0478
    (SB0476 / CH0477)
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - ClarificationDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0494 / CH0480
    (SB0477 / CH0479)
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in ServiceDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0492 / CH0473Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0390 / CH0535
    (SB0741 / CH0534)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of TrusteesDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0387State Retirement and Pension System - Truth in Pension Accounting ActDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0379
    (SB0475)
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and DeductionsDelegate GriffithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0376 / CH0221
    (SB0269 / CH0220)
State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in BenefitsDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0258
    (SB0800)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0239Full Pension Funding ActDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.