Social Services - Generally (O1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0752 / CH0316
    (HB1119 / CH0317)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1449Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term LimitsDelegate ReznikIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0884
    (SB0686 / CH0526)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0333 / CH0367Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.