State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0067 / CH0017Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control PurposesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0618Public Health - Baby Bumper Pads - Restrictions on SaleSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0484Maryland Open Meetings Act - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0485Open Meetings Act - Application of PenaltiesDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0070 / CH0459
    (SB0342 / CH0458)
State Government - Access to Public Records in Electronic Formats - Termination DateDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0230 / CH0209Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0844Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Addresses - Web Site NoticeSenator GettyIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0845Public Information Act - Required Denials - Electronic Mail AddressesSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0880Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Address - Database and DisclosureSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1280
    (SB0677)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0241Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulations - Public Hearings and VotingSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0379Regulations - Prohibition on Proposal and Adoption - Substantially Same Content as Failed BillSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0688
    (HB0090)
State Government - Access to Public Records - Firearm Ownership RecordsSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0090
    (SB0688)
State Government - Access to Public Records - Handgun Permit RecordsDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0825
    (HB1345)
Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0826
    (HB0331 / CH0612)
Open Meetings Act - Violations and PenaltiesSenator KittlemanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0342 / CH0458
    (HB0070 / CH0459)
State Government - Access to Public Records in Electronic Formats - Termination DateSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0961State Government - Maryland Public Information Act - Required Denials Regarding Firearm Dealers, Owners, and Permit HoldersDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0331 / CH0612
    (SB0826)
Open Meetings Act - Violations and PenaltiesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0970Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - CompensationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0971Regulations - Fees and Fines - Legislative Approval RequiredSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0385 / CH0250
    (HB0327)
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic FormSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0677
    (HB1280)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthoritySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0327
    (SB0385 / CH0250)
State Government - Health, Education, and Social Services - Submission of Documents in Electronic FormDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1345
    (SB0825)
Open Meetings Act - Public Body - DefinitionDelegate SchuhIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.